U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-00037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Porter
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 10, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Continue ]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 14, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 11, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 11, 2025: [Docket Call]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 10, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.