U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00335-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Burton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • April 08, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 10, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 10, 2025: [Extension of Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.