U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00348-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Daniels
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Motion Hearing ]
  • May 05, 2025: [Continue ]
  • May 05, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 31, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 26, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 26, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 10, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.