U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00132-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CARCIATI
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • March 31, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 19, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 17, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 14, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 14, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 14, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • March 12, 2025: [SEALED Document]
  • March 11, 2025: [SEALED Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.