U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00315-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WALLS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Continue Trial]
  • May 01, 2025: [(ELECTRONIC) NOTICE OF HEARING FOR CRIMINAL TERM]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • April 23, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Status Conference]
  • April 23, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 15, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Suppress]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 19, 2025: [Detention]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 19, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • March 18, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 18, 2025: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • March 11, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.