U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WHEELING
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - Sentencing]
  • April 21, 2025: [SEALED USPO Memorandum]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Rescheduling]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 11, 2025: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.