U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00274-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JOSEPH-MAJAK
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 22, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 14, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: [Case Reassigned]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [(ELECTRONIC) NOTICE OF HEARING FOR CRIMINAL TERM]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Cancellation]
  • March 17, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 17, 2025: [Factual Basis Document]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 12, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 11, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.