U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GAMBLE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • May 05, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 01, 2025: [(ELECTRONIC) NOTICE OF HEARING FOR CRIMINAL TERM]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Factual Basis Document]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 08, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 07, 2025: [Motions Referred]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Oral Motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • March 11, 2025: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • March 10, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.