U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00240-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MORRIS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 05, 2025: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • May 01, 2025: [(ELECTRONIC) NOTICE OF HEARING FOR CRIMINAL TERM]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Factual Basis Document]
  • April 17, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 31, 2025: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • March 14, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 11, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 10, 2025: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • March 10, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • March 10, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 10, 2025: [Arraignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.