U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fox, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 23, 2025: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • April 09, 2025: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • April 09, 2025: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • April 09, 2025: [Plea Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • March 27, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 27, 2025: [Factual Basis]
  • March 27, 2025: [Continue Other]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 17, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 13, 2025: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • March 11, 2025: [Suppress]
  • March 11, 2025: [Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.