U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00190-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dunham
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 04, 2025: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • April 04, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • April 03, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 02, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 01, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 01, 2025: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 01, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 01, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • March 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • March 11, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.