U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gutierrez-Lopez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • April 15, 2025: [Continue Other]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Bond]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 11, 2025: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 11, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • March 11, 2025: [Arraignment and Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.