U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00043-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hawthorne
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 23, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 21, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 18, 2025: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 18, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 18, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Arrest]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Transfer In/Probationer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.