U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00081-1
  • Case Name: USA v. THOMAS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Factual Basis Document]
  • May 01, 2025: [(ELECTRONIC) NOTICE OF HEARING FOR CRIMINAL TERM]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 11, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 11, 2025: [Oral Motion]
  • March 11, 2025: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.