U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thomason
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Service by Publication]
  • April 08, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 24, 2025: [Bond Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • March 24, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • March 24, 2025: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • March 24, 2025: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order Appointing Community Defender]
  • March 24, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: [Arrest]
  • March 12, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.