U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:23-cr-00056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hill et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Assembled Electronic Record on Appeal transmitted to 4CCA]
  • April 18, 2025: [USCA Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 10, 2025: [Certificate of Service ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Amend/Correct ]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • March 12, 2025: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • March 12, 2025: [RESTRICTED Appeal Transcript ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.