U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jones
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 21, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • April 21, 2025: [Continue ]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 20, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 19, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 18, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 18, 2025: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 17, 2025: [Detention]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 17, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 12, 2025: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 12, 2025: [Warrant Requested]
  • March 12, 2025: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.