U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jenkins
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 22, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 21, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 18, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 17, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 17, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 17, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 12, 2025: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 12, 2025: [Warrant Requested]
  • March 12, 2025: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.