U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00071-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Curry
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Service by Publication]
  • April 04, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • March 31, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 20, 2025: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 20, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 18, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 17, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 14, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • March 12, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.