U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00250-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harrison
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 27, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 26, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 26, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration ]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Set/Reset Motion and M&R Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.