U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-00056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Roundtree
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Judgment ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Sentencing ]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Restricted Sentencing Statement]
  • March 28, 2025: [Amended Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 21, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • March 20, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 20, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
  • March 20, 2025: [Continue Sentencing]
  • March 13, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.