U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sherrod
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 22, 2025: [Amended Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Continue ]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Text Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 17, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 17, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 17, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 12, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 12, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 12, 2025: [Detention]
  • March 12, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.