U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:25-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Crummy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 18, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 18, 2025: [Continue ]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Exhibit List ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 18, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 14, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 13, 2025: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 13, 2025: [Detention]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 13, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.