U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00070-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MAYES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 01, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Oral Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 20, 2025: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • March 18, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 13, 2025: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • March 13, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 13, 2025: [Oral Motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.