U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LEA
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 01, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Arraignment]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: [Waiver-Other]
  • March 21, 2025: [Waiver-Other]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 20, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • March 18, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 13, 2025: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • March 13, 2025: [Oral Motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 12, 2025: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.