U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00235-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LONG-BOOKER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • April 09, 2025: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment]
  • April 09, 2025: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • April 09, 2025: [Judgment]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 16, 2025: [SEALED Document]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 12, 2025: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.