U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00238-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GRACE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Revised Final]
  • April 14, 2025: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Revised Final]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • March 19, 2025: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • March 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • March 12, 2025: [Continue Sentencing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.