U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00264-1
  • Case Name: USA v. STARNER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Factual Basis Document]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 11, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 27, 2025: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
  • March 27, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 25, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 25, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 20, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 19, 2025: [Supplement]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.