U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00229-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CAMPBELL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [SEALED Notice of Apparent Violation]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [SEALED USPO Memorandum]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • April 15, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2025: [SEALED Notice of Apparent Violation]
  • April 10, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • April 08, 2025: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • March 22, 2025: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 17, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • March 17, 2025: [Motion for Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [SEALED Notice of Apparent Violation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.