U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00262-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MOYE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 15, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: [Factual Basis Document]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [(ELECTRONIC) NOTICE OF HEARING FOR CRIMINAL TERM]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Cancellation]
  • March 20, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 13, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 12, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.