U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-cr-00041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Spruill
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Transcript - Redacted]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Redact Transcript]
  • March 24, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 21, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • March 14, 2025: [Redact Transcript]
  • March 13, 2025: [SEALED Appeal Transcript ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • March 13, 2025: [Transcript - Appeal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.