U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cole
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 07, 2025: [Continue ]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 14, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 13, 2025: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.