U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00372-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MCCULLOUGH
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 18, 2025: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • April 18, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 15, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 18, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 18, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 16, 2025: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • March 13, 2025: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.