U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cr-00148-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Anderson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • April 30, 2025: [RESTRICTED Transcript]
  • April 02, 2025: [Motion for Compassionate Release - First Step Act]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 24, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • March 24, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 21, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 21, 2025: [Continue Sentencing]
  • March 13, 2025: [USCA Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.