U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cr-00184-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McIntyre
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 22, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • April 22, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 17, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • March 17, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • March 17, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.