U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:25-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sherlock
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice to Counsel]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 26, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 21, 2025: [Docket Call]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 21, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 18, 2025: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 14, 2025: [Detention]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 14, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 13, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.