U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vernon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 25, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Pretrial Release]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 14, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 14, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice-other]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 14, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 14, 2025: [Detention]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 14, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 13, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.