U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00347-1
  • Case Name: USA v. West
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 28, 2025: [Docket Call]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • April 10, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Motion Referred]
  • March 19, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.