U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-00035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Alwan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Judgment ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 11, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 11, 2025: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Sentencing ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 06, 2025: [Restricted Sentencing Statement]
  • April 02, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Objection to PSI]
  • March 14, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Objection to PSI]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.