U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:24-cr-00055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Locklear et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Objection to PSI]
  • April 24, 2025: [Restricted Sentencing Statement]
  • April 17, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • April 14, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Objection to PSI]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • March 18, 2025: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 18, 2025: [Plea Agreement ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.