U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00194-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Holland-Kornegay
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 24, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice-other]
  • April 22, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Special Appearance - Defendant - Non-District Counsel]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 18, 2025: [Certificate of Service ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 13, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 13, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 13, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.