U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00351-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ALLRED
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • April 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 17, 2025: [Case Reassigned]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion ]
  • April 14, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 14, 2025: [SEALED Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Substitute Attorney]
  • April 04, 2025: [(ELECTRONIC) NOTICE OF HEARING FOR CRIMINAL TERM]
  • April 04, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • April 04, 2025: [SEALED Attachments to Main Document]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice-Other]
  • April 01, 2025: [Quash Indictment/Information]
  • April 01, 2025: [SEALED Attachments to Main Document]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice-Other]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 20, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 20, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 13, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.