U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. STRONG
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [SEALED Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 20, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 20, 2025: [SEALED Order on SEALED Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 17, 2025: [SEALED Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 14, 2025: [Exam Report SEALED]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.