U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cr-00319-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Cummings et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [USCA Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notification to Appeals Court of Filing]
  • May 01, 2025: [Amended Judgment]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Correct Sentence Pursuant to Rule 35a ]
  • May 01, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Proposed Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency - Failure to File Proposed Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Correct Sentence Pursuant to Rule 35a ]
  • April 29, 2025: [Assembled Electronic Record on Appeal transmitted to 4CCA]
  • April 29, 2025: [USCA Case Number ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 22, 2025: [Judgment ]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 19, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.