U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00334-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Eaton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 22, 2025: [Continue ]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 27, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 24, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 24, 2025: [Docket Call]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 24, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 24, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 21, 2025: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 21, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 20, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 20, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 19, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 19, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Detention]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 19, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 19, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 14, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.