U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-00067-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Anthony
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 25, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 11, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Motion Referred]
  • April 10, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Continue ]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.