U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:24-cr-00092-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harris
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Judgment ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 23, 2025: [Sentencing ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Restricted Sentencing Statement]
  • April 17, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • March 18, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • March 18, 2025: [Continue Sentencing]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.