U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cr-00195-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Workman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 05, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 05, 2025: [Continue Sentencing]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 19, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 19, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Modification to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 18, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [1Fox Case Reassigned]
  • March 14, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 14, 2025: [USCA Mandate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.