U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-00062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chambers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Judgment ]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 08, 2025: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 08, 2025: [Exhibit List ]
  • April 08, 2025: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • April 08, 2025: [Sentencing ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Objection to PSI]
  • March 18, 2025: [Objection to PSI]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.