U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Werner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 02, 2025: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • March 28, 2025: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • March 28, 2025: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • March 17, 2025: [Continue Other]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 14, 2025: [Pretrial Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.